Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3045 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022