House
|
05/04/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Lepak
|
|
|