Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2022