House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Hardin (Tommy)
|
|
|