Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022