Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3065 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Amended

Bill March 29, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022