Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3065 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/21/2022

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 3065 	By: Manger and Gann of the 
House   
 
  and 
 
  Weaver of the Senate  
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to public health and safety; amending 
63 O.S. 2021, Section 2 -103, which relates to the 
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; 
authorizing commissioned employees to purchase 
certain firearms prior to retirement; providing 
purchasing requirements; providing for the transfer 
and modification of ownership records; directing 
proceeds be deposited into certain revolving fund; 
and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Public health and safety 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     63 O.S. 2021, Section 2 -103, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 2-103. A.  The Director shall be appointed by the 
Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control 
Commission.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics 
and Dangerous Drugs Control on January 1, 1984, shall be initia lly 
appointed as Director. The succeeding Director shall, at the time 
of the appointment, have a Bachelor 's Degree from an accredited 
college or university and at least five (5) years of experience in 
drug law enforcement.  The Director may appoint necess ary 
assistants, agents, and other personnel to perform the work of the 
office and may prescribe their titles and duties and fix their 
compensation pursuant to Merit Syste m rules.  The Director may 
appoint employees to the positions of Chief of Law Enforcem ent  ENR. H. B. NO. 3065 	Page 2 
Information and Technology, Public Information/Education Officer, 
Training Officer, Program Administrators, Grants Administrator, 
Criminal Analysts, Legal Secretary, and Typist Clerk/Spanish 
Transcriptionists.  The positions shall be unclassified and e xempt 
from the rules and procedures of the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services, except leave regulations.  The office of the 
Director shall be located at a suita ble place in Oklahoma City, 
Oklahoma. 
 
B.  1.  Agents appointed by the Director shall h ave the powers 
of peace officers generally; provided, the Director may appoint 
special agents and reserve special agents, who shall be unclassified 
employees of the state , to meet specific investigatory needs.  
Special agents and reserve special agents sha ll not be required to 
meet the age and educational requirements as specified in this 
section. 
 
2.  Agents appointed on and after November 1, 1998, shall be at 
least twenty-one (21) years of age and shall have a Bachelor 's 
Degree from an accredited college o r university. 
 
3.  Each entering agent, with the exception of special agents, 
shall be required to serve one (1) year in a probationary status as 
a prerequisite to being p laced on permanent status. 
 
C.  Agents appointed pursuant to the provisions of this sec tion 
shall have the responsibility of investigating alleged violations 
and shall have the authority to arrest those suspected of having 
violated the provisions of the Uni form Controlled Dangerous 
Substances Act, as well as the crimes of money laundering an d human 
trafficking, as otherwise set forth by laws of this state. 
 
D.  The Director may appoint reserve special agents who shall 
not be considered employees of the state and shall serve at the will 
of the Director.  Reserve special agents shall complete a minimum of 
two hundred forty (240) hours of training pursuant to Section 3311 
of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes and may not serve more than one 
hundred forty (140) hou rs per calendar month.  Upon completion of 
training, reserve special agents appointed by the Director shall 
have general peace officer powers and the authority to arrest those 
suspected of having violated the provisions of the Uniform 
Controlled Dangerous Substances Act.  The agency may expend funds 
related to training and special reserve a gents may receive travel 
expenses pursuant to the State Travel Reimbursement Act. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 3065 	Page 3 
E.  A commissioned employee of the Oklahoma State Bureau of 
Narcotics and Dangerous Drug s Control shall be entitled to receive, 
upon retirement by reason of length of service , the continued 
custody and possession of the sidearm and badge carried by such 
employee immediately prior to retirement.  In addition to the 
sidearm carried by the commissione d employee immediately prior to 
retirement, the commissioned employee may purcha se the rifle or 
shotgun, or both, issued to the commissioned employee immediately 
prior to retirement upon approval from the Director.  The cost to 
the commissioned employee of purchasing the firearm shall be the 
state-approved firearms vendor trade-in value, and upon payment of 
that price, the commissioned employee shall be entitled to ownership 
of the firearm.  Any records regarding the ownership of each firearm 
transferred shall be modified to reflect the transfer to the 
commissioned employee.  Proceeds from the purchase of the firearm 
shall be deposited in the Bureau of Narcotics Revolving Fund 
established pursuant to Section 2-107 of this title. 
 
F.  A commissioned employee of the Bureau may be entitled to 
receive, upon retirement by reason of disability , the continued 
custody and possession of the si dearm and badge carried by such 
employee immediately prior to retirement upon written approval of 
the Director. 
 
G.  Custody and possession of the s idearm and badge of a 
commissioned employee killed in the lin e of duty may be awarded by 
the Director to the spouse or next of kin o f the deceased employee. 
 
H.  Custody and possession of the sidearm and badge of a 
commissioned employee who dies while emplo yed at the Oklahoma State 
Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous D rugs Control may be awarded by 
the Director to the spouse or next of ki n of the deceased employee. 
 
I.  Any Director appointed on or after July 1, 2003, shall be 
eligible to participate in either the Oklahoma Public Employees 
Retirement System or in the Okl ahoma Law Enforcement Retirement 
System and shall make an irrevocable e lection in writing to 
participate in one of the two retirement systems. 
 
J.  Any employee of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Nar cotics and 
Dangerous Drugs Control in a classified position u nder the Merit 
System of the Personnel Administr ation who is appointed Director, 
Deputy Director, Acting Director or Acting Deputy Director shall 
have a right to return to the highest previously held classified 
position without any loss of rights, privileg es or benefits  ENR. H. B. NO. 3065 	Page 4 
immediately upon completion of th e duties of the employe e, provided 
the employee is not otherwise disqualified. 
 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 3065 	Page 5 
Passed the House of Representatives the 7th day of March, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 20th day of April, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 2 0_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________