House
|
05/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Manger
|
|
|