Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3066 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2022

Amended

Bill March 30, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022