House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Smith
|
|
|