Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3079 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill March 29, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022