House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Leewright; authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Hilbert
|
|
|