Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022