Senate | 04/13/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Remove as author Senator Montgomery; authored by Senator Howard | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Emergency removed | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Remove Representative Hilbert as principal House author and substitute with Representative Bashore | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |