Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3082 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022