House | 04/28/2022 | SA's received | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 13 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Enacting clause restored | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Withdrawn from Education committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 27; Ayes: 61 Nays: 27 | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |