Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022