Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Russ
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Murdock, Paxton, Jech, Rader, Weaver, Brooks, Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Gann, McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
|
|
|