Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022