Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022