Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 17 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, McDugle | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen, Roberts (Sean) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |