Senate | 04/04/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Merrick | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Remove as author Senator Merrick; authored by Senator Standridge | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 35 | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Emergency removed | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Merrick (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |