Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Remove Representative Phillips as principal House author and substitute with Representative Strom
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Phillips
|
|
|