House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 17; Ayes: 66 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Leewright, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), Bashore, Kendrix
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Cornwell
|
|
|