Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |