Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader |