Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Jech, Bullard, Daniels, Simpson, Kirt, Boren
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|