Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Waldron | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Provenzano | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Nollan |