House | 05/02/2022 | SA's received | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Garvin | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Pederson | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Merrick | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Walke |