Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck, Bashore, Fetgatter | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Stark, McDugle, Phillips | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Roe |