Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2022