Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3344 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022