House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|