House
|
04/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dobrinski
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|