Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Tourism | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Pae |