House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|