House
|
04/21/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|