Senate | 03/29/2022 | Referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Grego |