Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Lawson |