Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Withdrawn from Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Lawson |