Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Authored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Provenzano |