Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Grego
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Kendrix, Roberts (Eric), Phillips, Roe, Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Fetgatter, Johns, Moore, Frix, Dollens, Sims, West (Tammy), Hasenbeck, Townley, Dobrinski, Kerbs, May, Lawson, Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|