House
|
04/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 27; Ayes: 61 Nays: 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|