House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Pemberton, Pugh, Dahm, Merrick, Stanley, Taylor, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Conley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker, Phillips, Nollan
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|