Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 29 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative McBride |