House
|
04/28/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Remove Representative Roberts (Dustin) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|