Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | An Act | |
2 | - | ENROLLED HOUSE | |
1 | + | ||
2 | + | ||
3 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3615 SFLR Page 1 | |
4 | + | (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 | |
5 | + | 2 | |
6 | + | 3 | |
7 | + | 4 | |
8 | + | 5 | |
9 | + | 6 | |
10 | + | 7 | |
11 | + | 8 | |
12 | + | 9 | |
13 | + | 10 | |
14 | + | 11 | |
15 | + | 12 | |
16 | + | 13 | |
17 | + | 14 | |
18 | + | 15 | |
19 | + | 16 | |
20 | + | 17 | |
21 | + | 18 | |
22 | + | 19 | |
23 | + | 20 | |
24 | + | 21 | |
25 | + | 22 | |
26 | + | 23 | |
27 | + | 24 | |
28 | + | ||
29 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION | |
30 | + | April 11, 2022 | |
31 | + | ||
32 | + | ||
33 | + | ENGROSSED HOUSE | |
3 | 34 | BILL NO. 3615 By: Ford of the House | |
4 | 35 | ||
5 | 36 | and | |
6 | 37 | ||
7 | 38 | Taylor of the Senate | |
8 | - | ||
9 | - | ||
10 | 39 | ||
11 | 40 | ||
12 | 41 | ||
13 | 42 | ||
14 | 43 | An Act relating to public health; amending 63 O.S. | |
15 | 44 | 2021, Section 1-229.35, which relates to vapor | |
16 | 45 | manufacturers reporting; changing compliance | |
17 | 46 | deadline; and declaring an emergency. | |
18 | 47 | ||
19 | 48 | ||
20 | 49 | ||
21 | 50 | ||
22 | - | SUBJECT: Public health | |
23 | - | ||
24 | 51 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA: | |
25 | - | ||
26 | 52 | SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-229.35, is | |
27 | 53 | amended to read as follows: | |
28 | - | ||
29 | 54 | Section 1-229.35 A. Beginning July 1, 2022 2023, every | |
30 | 55 | manufacturer of a vapor product that is sold or intended to be sold | |
31 | 56 | in this state, whether directly or through a distributor, re tailer, | |
32 | 57 | or similar intermediary or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver | |
33 | 58 | an attestation under penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic | |
34 | 59 | Beverage Laws Enforcement (ABLE) Commission cer tifying that, as of | |
35 | 60 | the date of such attestation: | |
36 | - | ||
37 | 61 | 1. The vapor product was available for purchase in the United | |
38 | 62 | States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a | |
39 | 63 | marketing order for the vap or product by submitting a Premarket | |
64 | + | ||
65 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3615 SFLR Page 2 | |
66 | + | (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 | |
67 | + | 2 | |
68 | + | 3 | |
69 | + | 4 | |
70 | + | 5 | |
71 | + | 6 | |
72 | + | 7 | |
73 | + | 8 | |
74 | + | 9 | |
75 | + | 10 | |
76 | + | 11 | |
77 | + | 12 | |
78 | + | 13 | |
79 | + | 14 | |
80 | + | 15 | |
81 | + | 16 | |
82 | + | 17 | |
83 | + | 18 | |
84 | + | 19 | |
85 | + | 20 | |
86 | + | 21 | |
87 | + | 22 | |
88 | + | 23 | |
89 | + | 24 | |
90 | + | ||
40 | 91 | Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to the | |
41 | 92 | United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or | |
42 | - | ||
43 | 93 | 2. The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other | |
44 | 94 | authorization for the vapor product fr om the FDA pursuant to Section | |
45 | 95 | 387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. | |
46 | - | ENR. H. B. NO. 3615 Page 2 | |
47 | 96 | B. The manufacturer shall notify the A BLE Commission within | |
48 | 97 | thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, | |
49 | 98 | including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or | |
50 | 99 | other authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the | |
51 | 100 | vapor product, either temporarily or pe rmanently, from the United | |
52 | 101 | States market. | |
53 | - | ||
54 | 102 | C. The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of | |
55 | 103 | the manufacturers that have provide d attestations that comply with | |
56 | 104 | subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed | |
57 | 105 | in such attestations. The ABLE Commission shall: | |
58 | - | ||
59 | 106 | 1. Make the directory available for public inspection on its | |
60 | 107 | website on or before October 1, 2022 2023; and | |
61 | - | ||
62 | 108 | 2. Update the directory as necessary to corr ect mistakes and to | |
63 | 109 | add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to ma intain the | |
64 | 110 | directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. | |
65 | - | ||
66 | 111 | D. It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly , | |
67 | 112 | to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, ba rter, or furnish in | |
68 | 113 | this state any vapor product that is not included i n the directory. | |
69 | 114 | ||
115 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3615 SFLR Page 3 | |
116 | + | (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 | |
117 | + | 2 | |
118 | + | 3 | |
119 | + | 4 | |
120 | + | 5 | |
121 | + | 6 | |
122 | + | 7 | |
123 | + | 8 | |
124 | + | 9 | |
125 | + | 10 | |
126 | + | 11 | |
127 | + | 12 | |
128 | + | 13 | |
129 | + | 14 | |
130 | + | 15 | |
131 | + | 16 | |
132 | + | 17 | |
133 | + | 18 | |
134 | + | 19 | |
135 | + | 20 | |
136 | + | 21 | |
137 | + | 22 | |
138 | + | 23 | |
139 | + | 24 | |
140 | + | ||
70 | 141 | SECTION 2. It being immediately necessary for the p reservation | |
71 | 142 | of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby | |
72 | 143 | declared to exist, by re ason whereof this act shall take effect and | |
73 | - | be in full force from and after its passage and approval. ENR. H. B. NO. 3615 Page 3 | |
74 | - | Passed the House of Representatives the 23rd day of March, 2022. | |
75 | - | ||
76 | - | ||
77 | - | ||
78 | - | ||
79 | - | Presiding Officer of the House | |
80 | - | of Representatives | |
81 | - | ||
82 | - | ||
83 | - | Passed the Senate the 25th day of April, 2022. | |
84 | - | ||
85 | - | ||
86 | - | ||
87 | - | ||
88 | - | Presiding Officer of the Senate | |
89 | - | ||
90 | - | ||
91 | - | OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR | |
92 | - | Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ | |
93 | - | day of ___________________, 20_ ______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. | |
94 | - | By: _________________________________ | |
95 | - | Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ | |
96 | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. | |
97 | - | ||
98 | - | ||
99 | - | _________________________________ | |
100 | - | Governor of the State of Oklahoma | |
101 | - | ||
102 | - | OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE | |
103 | - | Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ | |
104 | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. | |
105 | - | By: _________________________________ | |
106 | - | ||
144 | + | be in full force from and after its passage and approval. | |
145 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVI CES | |
146 | + | April 11, 2022 - DO PASS |