House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named David, Murdock, Pederson, Kidd, Merrick, Boren, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Dempsey
|
|
|