House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Talley, Randleman
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Sterling
|
|
|