Senate | 03/28/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Sterling |